Trustees KEELE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1173328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew David Harris Chair 10 September 2021
None on record
Arjun Patel Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Georgia Souter Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Maisie Glock Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Jade Cioffi Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Tom Guilbert-Newell Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Dan Lay Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Arjun Sinha Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Jack Medlin Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Valerie Newman Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
Prof Marilyn Andrews Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record