TAVISTOCK HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1173744
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN WRIGHT Trustee 26 September 2017 None on record
Anthony Charles Rawlins Trustee 13 January 2021 None on record
Dr GERALDINE PARLBY Chair 26 September 2017 None on record
Sandra Jones Trustee 07 November 2018 None on record
ALEXANDER EDWARD METTLER Trustee 08 February 2017 None on record
ANDREW MAIN Trustee 26 September 2017 None on record
Dr THOMAS GRAHAM Trustee 26 September 2017 None on record
COUNCILLOR PHILIP RICHARD SANDERS Trustee 08 February 2017
MELDON VIADUCT COMPANY LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
THE PLYMOUTH ASTOR TRUST (VHS) Charity reporting is up to date
SIMON MATTHEW HIRST Trustee 29 August 2018 None on record