THE ANGLESEY AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 510048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 01 October 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 01 October 2020 31 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 18 October 2019 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 18 October 2019 48 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 21 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 21 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 11 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 11 July 2017 On time Download