Accounts and annual returns Y GORLAN.

Charity number: 1173089
Charity reporting is overdue by 716 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 716 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 716 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 July 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 11 July 2019 11 days late Download Open in new window