BISHOP SUTTON PRE-SCHOOL AND FOREST CLUB

Charity number: 1172849
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 August 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 August 2021 53 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 October 2020 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 October 2020 97 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 05 April 2019 On time Download