Trustees CITY, UNIVERSITY OF LONDON STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1173858

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saundarya Rastogi | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yavuz Emin Kafadar | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fortune Sampson | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gesmina Tsourrai | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jesutofunmi Odugbemi | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rumnique Gill | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nick Ratcliffe | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL ANTHONY LANTHAM | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.