Governing document WETHERBY CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 510264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/10/1974 AS AMENDED ON 16/06/1980 AS AMENDED ON 09/05/1994 AS AMENDED ON 03/11/2014 as amended on 04 Aug 2022 as amended on 23 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE ITS MEMBERS AND THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF CHORAL MUSIC THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF A SERIES OF CONCERTS THROUGHOUT THE SEASON
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.