Trustees WETHERBY CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 510264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Marsh | Chair | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liane Dawe | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lane | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Auld | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gibbs | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Christine Outram | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Malcolm Smith | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Brownridge Ms | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Hart | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.