LINTHORPE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 510300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 14 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 11 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 19 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required