Accounts and annual returns SERVING THE CREATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178707
Charity reporting is overdue by 261 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 261 days
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 261 days
Annual return 01 December 2021 30 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2021 30 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 December 2018 03 October 2019 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2018 05 October 2019 4 days late Download Open in new window