Governing document CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY STOCKPORT
Charity number: 510501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BYLAWS ADOPTED FEBRUARY 15 1922 AS SUBSEQUENTLEY AMENDED 28 OCTOBER 1980 AS AMENDED 26 OCTOBER 1993 AS AMENDED ON 10 APR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 26 FEB 2018 as amended on 16 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
1. GENERAL PURPOSES OF CHURCH. 2. PROVISION OF READING ROOM.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.