Accounts and annual returns PLAWSWORTH AND KIMBLESWORTH COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 1174075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window