New Model Institute for Technology and Engineering

Charity number: 1176550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Maia Kierann Shah Trustee 20 September 2021 None on record
Professor Elena Maria Rodriguez-Falcon Trustee 20 September 2021
THE ENGINEERING DEVELOPMENT TRUST Received: On time
Terence Jagger Chair 01 April 2021
TREE AID Received: On time
NATIONAL BIODIVERSITY NETWORK TRUST Received: On time
Rowena Dawn Innocent Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Martin John Hitchin Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Nicholas Lieven Trustee 23 November 2021 None on record
Aimee Clark Trustee 20 September 2021 None on record
Marc Anthony Leppard Trustee 20 September 2021 None on record
JON GORRINGE Trustee 05 April 2018 None on record
Dr Wendy Victoria Finlay Trustee 20 September 2021
THE OFFICE OF THE INDEPENDENT ADJUDICATOR FOR HIGHER EDUCATION Received: On time