Governing document SPECIAL CARE INFANT PARENT SUPPORT (SCIPS)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JANUARY 1981 as amended on 20 Jun 2020 as amended on 29 Jun 2020 as amended on 28 Jul 2021 as amended on 25 Jan 2021 as amended on 11 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
The relief, care and treatment of premature and sick newborn babies in the Neonatal Intensive Care Unit (NICU) at University Hospital Wales, Cardiff by providing and assisting in the provision of specialised medical or surgical equipment and improved amenities.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.