GROWING COMPASSIONATE COMMUNITIES

Charity number: 1176047
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 October 2019 18 August 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2019 16 September 2020 44 days late Download
Annual return 03 October 2018 28 August 2019 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2018 28 August 2019 25 days late Download