Trustees JAIN SAMAJ, MANCHESTER
Charity number: 511076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kiran Mehta | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shailesh Mehta | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jyotsna Patel | Trustee | 15 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Piyush G Mehta | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mehul Mehta | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Falguni Mehta | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hiren VORA | Trustee | 21 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nehal Mahendra Mehta | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nitesh Shah | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dipesh Harkishan Mehta | Trustee | 16 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
SAROJ PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.