Accounts and annual returns OASTEA DOMNULUI LONDON

Charity number: 1178507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 24 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 18 September 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 30 August 2020 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required