Trustees ACTION HOUSING AND SUPPORT LIMITED
Charity number: 511265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony De'Ath | Chair | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Antony Taylor | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frank Hanson | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Claire Frazer | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Trevor Baylis | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Louise Warnock | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Knowles | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.