Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WALTON ON THE HILL

Charity number: 1176435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window