Accounts and annual returns THE COMMUNITY OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN AT WANTAGE

Charity number: 1181510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 24 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 24 July 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 13 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 13 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window