Accounts and annual returns AUGHTON ST MICHAEL'S C E SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 512221
Charity reporting is overdue by 1735 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 274 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 274 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 639 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 639 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1004 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1004 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1370 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1370 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1735 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1735 days