ANDOVER TWENTY1
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Andover Twenty1 is a parent-led Charity. Our purpose is to provide support to people with Down's Syndrome and their families, from birth and through school. We want our members to reach their potential, socially and academically. We support children and their families who live within a 25 mile radius of Andover including Newbury, Winchester and Salisbury as well as smaller towns and villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
People
7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 29 April 2019: CIO registration
- ANDOVERTWENTY1 (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNA-MARIE FAUVELLE | Chair | 29 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Alice Victoria Leuenberger | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Ann Mackenzie | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ogg | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rowen Gower | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Matthews | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Louise Benning | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.71k | £23.17k | £9.01k | £18.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.06k | £17.63k | £16.70k | £15.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DOWNS SYNDROME, THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS LIVING WITHIN A 25-MILE RADIUS OF ANDOVER, HAMPSHIRE, UK IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE, TRAINING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, WITH A VIEW TO CREATING AND DEVELOPING CONDITIONS WHICH WILL ENABLE PEOPLE WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME TO ATTAIN THEIR FULL POTENTIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 Peake Way
Charlton
ANDOVER
Hampshire
SP10 4FA
- Phone:
- 07858046536
- Email:
- andovertwenty1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window