Accounts and annual returns T.E.E.S (TOGETHER ENGAGE ENCOURAGE SUPPORT)

Charity number: 1185327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2023 30 January 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 30 January 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 03 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 03 February 2023 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window