Accounts and annual returns THE LITTLE ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1184069
Charity reporting is overdue by 43 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 43 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 43 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 23 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window