Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEWS WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity number: 1183263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Matthew Hird Chair 16 July 2013
None on record
Jordan Dearn Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Jason Coley Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Rachel Reid Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Brian Palmer Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Rebecca Hedger Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Charlotte Taft Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Lee Blakemore Trustee 31 March 2019
None on record
Jack Hedger Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record