CONSETT MOORSIDE COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 514421
Charity reporting is overdue by 1613 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 152 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 152 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 517 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 517 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 883 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 883 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1248 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1248 days
Annual return 31 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1613 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1613 days