Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARBARA EARLSDON COVENTRY
Charity number: 1185293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tulo Dirk Raistrick | Chair | 11 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Karen Mogan | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Teresa Maria Witt | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Paul Watts | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Oluwaseyi Fabunmi | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Ann Moore | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Elizabeth Moorley | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Alastair Owen | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Cecilia Mason | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Steve Gilford Matthews | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Manning | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Anna Stevens | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian Muir Leitch | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Andrea French | Trustee | 24 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Mary Owen | Trustee | 06 March 2003 |
|
|
||||
Keith John Wright | Trustee | 14 March 1996 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.