Accounts and annual returns DORCHESTER ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 1187063
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 December 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 February 2022 116 days late Download Open in new window