Financial history CAMBRIAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR DEAF CHILDREN IN WALES

Charity number: 515848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £18.51k £21.29k £20.05k £21.01k £17.71k
Total expenditure £16.76k £21.17k £18.50k £19.09k £23.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A