Accounts and annual returns THE AMC FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1191625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 April 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 April 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window