Accounts and annual returns TRURO EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1191260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 April 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 April 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 August 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 August 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window