THE MYTON HOSPICES

Charity number: 516287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.04m £11.19m £11.47m £11.92m £12.47m
Total expenditure £11.30m £11.74m £12.14m £11.97m £10.63m
Income from government contracts £2.55m £2.55m £2.57m £2.69m N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £2.96m
Income - Donations and legacies £4.11m £4.25m £4.30m £4.47m £3.77m
Income - Other trading activities £4.29m £4.30m £4.48m £4.60m £3.01m
Income - Charitable activities £2.55m £2.55m £2.59m £2.69m £2.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.46m
Income - Investment £90.50k £88.96k £97.71k £89.68k £70.73k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £75.00k £2.97m
Income - Legacies £1.85m £1.68m £1.60m £1.14m £1.31m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.33m £8.65m £8.71m £8.44m £7.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.97m £3.09m £3.43m £3.53m £2.98m
Expenditure - Governance £25.15k £28.47k £0 £9.26k £14.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £15.59k £16.03k £15.54k £16.37k £17.07k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0