Trustees EQUAL AQUA
Charity number: 1190730
Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nishay Nathwani | Chair | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cecilia Grace Atim Oyet | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Micheala Chan | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Garth Singleton | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Chadwick | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas William McLenachan | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.