Trustees LUCY PRICE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity number: 516967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOUISE ANNE GEORGINA GIVEN | Chair | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Martin PARKES | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Deslandes | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Newman | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 24 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL PHILLIP THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.