Accounts and annual returns CLEMENTHORPE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 517051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 September 2022 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 September 2022 435 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 September 2022 800 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 September 2022 1166 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required