THE RESPITE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Since 2001 (we became a CIO in 2021) we have enabled Carers, who are ordinary people doing extraordinary things, to obtain a well earned break by funding an alternative Carer to act in their place whilst they have a break. Breaks can take the form of anything from enabling attendance at an evening class, a weekend break or longer. We also provide free week long seaside holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People
4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Clark | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Valerie Margaret England | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Hon. Alderman Alexander Michael Bentley | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Ann England | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.63k | £108.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £329.07k | £132.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND POVERTY OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, LONG-TERM PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS OR TERMINAL ILLNESSES, AND THEIR CARERS, WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM, BY (A) OFFERING ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THOSE IN NEED TO SECURE RESPITE CARE AND (B) PROVIDING RESPITE BREAKS AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highfield Barn
Lewdown
OKEHAMPTON
EX20 4DS
- Phone:
- 01566783383
- Email:
- help@respiteassociation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window