WYBUNBURY TOWER PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 517869
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN LINDSAY BOOTH Trustee None on record
HEATHER WALKER Trustee 19 January 2012 None on record
David Eccleston Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Jon Lea Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
SUE BROWNELL Trustee None on record
TRACEY LOUISE FARLEIGH Trustee
MOTHERWELL CHESHIRE CIO Received: On time
John Cliffe Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
PETER SIMON BALDWIN Trustee 02 February 2013 None on record
MARK WALKER Chair None on record
STEWART ALEXANDER HOWCROFT Trustee None on record
MARTIN HOWARD PIKE Trustee 02 February 2013 None on record