Governing document LEICESTER CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA
Charity number: 518866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 FEBRUARY 1902 AS AMENDED 5 MARCH 1924, 10 JANUARY 1940, APRIL 1972 FEBRUARY 1976, 26 APRIL 2006 AND 21 APRIL 2010.
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRACTICES OF THE CHRISTADELPHIAN DENOMINATION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.