Trustees 1ST YATE SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1196247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sam Jefferies | Chair | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Charles Taylor | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jyorgia Isis Phelp Hitchings | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Howat | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Stacey | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Kirk | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Andrew Spiteri | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Butler | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Elizabeth Sullivan | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Anne Wiltshire | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.