BLACKWELL MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 520417
Removed charity
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 31 DEC 1924 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10 DEC 1935 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
A RECREATION OR PLEASURE GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF WORKERS IN AND ABOT COAL MINES IN THE PARISH OF BLACKWELL
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 14 May 1965 : registered
  • 17 January 2020 : removed (FUNDS TRANSFERRED (GI))
Other names
  • BLACKWELL MINER WELFARE SOCIAL CLUB (Working name)
What the charity did
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helped
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space