TOWN HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 520590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required