1ST HENSINGHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 07 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 07 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 13 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 29 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required