Accounts and annual returns 68TH LEICESTER BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 25 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 01 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 01 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required