Accounts and annual returns THE GRIFFITHS CHARITY

Charity number: 525727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 11 December 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 02 October 2023 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 454 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 02 October 2023 581 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 02 October 2023 946 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 02 October 2023 1311 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required