Trustees THE PRESTON POSTGRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE
Charity number: 526668
Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alison Sykes | Chair | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Anne Hemsworth | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Cullen | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gerry Skailes | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pat White | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paladugu Madhavi | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR MARK PUGH | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr KAREN KIDNER | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALISON GALE | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
VANITA BROOKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr KAISER CHAUDHRI | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.