ROBERT MOORE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parish of Winster
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People
2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 20 December 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT DONALD GREATOREX | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
DONALD MALCOLM SHIMWELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200 | £200 | £200 | £200 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £50 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 April 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 22 April 2020 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 20TH MAY 1718. (P.R. VOL.XVIII P.94)
Charitable objects
TEACHING TEN POOR CHILDREN OF WINSTER TO READ.
Area of benefit
WINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashton House
West Bank
Winster
MATLOCK
DE4 2DQ
- Phone:
- 01629650954
- Email:
- rob.gtx68@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window