Accounts and annual returns CEDARS CHARITABLE TRUST, GATESHEAD

Charity number: 527416
Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 26 June 2023 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 May 2023 343 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 09 May 2023 708 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 March 2021 277 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required