Financial history SHREWSBURY SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 528415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £1.13m £1.50m £1.43m £1.01m £958.33k
Total expenditure £1.17m £1.71m £1.22m £1.62m £940.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.03m £1.40m £1.31m £902.17k £859.28k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £1.74k £0 £0 £0 £1.00k
Income - Investment £96.81k £93.36k £116.23k £103.01k £100.05k
Income - Other £0 £3.39k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £30.43k £33.91k £30.88k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £822.36k £1.36m £819.22k £1.25m £664.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds £344.68k £347.99k £396.81k £369.32k £276.83k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £822.36k £1.36m £819.22k £1.25m £644.13k
Expenditure - Investment management £17.45k £20.98k £12.75k £16.61k £23.60k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0