QUEEN MARY'S SCHOOLS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1175360-1
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 26 APR 2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 NOV 2007 AS AMENDED BY TRUST MODIFICATION ORDER DATED 27 MAY 2011 AS AMENDED ON 22 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
1) THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE SCHOOLS OF THE FOUNDATION OR ANY FORMER SCHOOL OF THE FOUNDATION WHICH HAS BECOME AN ACADEMY WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE ACADEMIES ACT 2010. 2) TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOLS OF THE FOUNDATION BY THE AWARD OF; A) SCHOLARSHIPS TENABLE TO ANY SCHOOL OF THE FOUNDATION TO PUPILS SELECTED ON THE GROUNDS OF MERIT, B) LEAVING EXHIBITIONS, TO PUPILS WHO HAVE ATTENDED A SCHOOL OF THE FOUNDATION FOR AT LEAST TWO YEARS, TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL OR TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES OR FOR THE PURPOSE OF ENABLING THE EXHIBITOR TO PURSUE A COURSE OF STUDY APPROVED BY THEM. C) MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES FOR PUPILS WHO NEED FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO ATTEND ANY SCHOOL OF THE FOUNDATION, AND D) PRIZES OR OTHER SUITABLE REWARDS OR MARKS OF DISTINCTION TO ANY PUPIL WORTHY OR REWARD OR DISTINCTION. 3) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS ATTENDING THE SCHOOLS OF THE FOUNDATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 21 February 1964 : registered
Other names
  • QUEEN MARY'S SCHOOLS (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of