LUCILLA DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 700241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £6.11k £6.64k £8.91k £8.92k £2.87k
Total expenditure £4.19k £5.46k £8.78k £6.01k £3.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A